U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00500-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BYERLY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • August 17, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 17, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 17, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 11, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Terminate Motions]
  • August 10, 2021: [Exclude]
  • August 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Filing Trial Exhibits Introduced Into Evidence]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order of Distribution of Funds]
  • July 28, 2021: [.Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [.Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 26, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 15, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.