U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00526-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ENTREKIN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2021: [Exclude]
  • September 22, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 23, 2021: [.Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 23, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 23, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 23, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 15, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 15, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.