U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00099
  • Case Name: APPLICATION OF LUCILLE HOLDINGS PTE LTD UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1782 et al v. EDGE FUNDS MANAGEMENT LLC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 13, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Status Report]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Status Report]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 02, 2022: [Motion For Order]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • May 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of QC]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • March 21, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 15, 2022: [Supplemental Memorandum]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 04, 2022: [Discovery]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • March 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • February 23, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 22, 2022: [Discovery Hearing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 15, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 11, 2022: [Supplemental Memorandum]
  • February 11, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • February 04, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 04, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 11, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • January 06, 2022: [Surreply]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Response to motion]
  • December 08, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 08, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • December 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 11, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • August 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to]
  • August 09, 2021: [Response to motion]
  • August 06, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 22, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • July 20, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.