U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00098
  • Case Name: COALITION FOR APP FAIRNESS et al v. APPLE INC.,
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Receipt and Acknowledgment of Transfer Papers]
  • August 16, 2021: [Case Transferred Out]
  • August 05, 2021: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • August 04, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • August 03, 2021: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • August 03, 2021: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • August 02, 2021: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • August 02, 2021: [Reply to opposition to motion]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 28, 2021: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • July 28, 2021: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • July 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 21, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 20, 2021: [.Order]
  • July 20, 2021: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • July 20, 2021: [Compel]
  • July 20, 2021: [Transfer Case]
  • July 20, 2021: [Expedite]
  • July 20, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 19, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 19, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • July 19, 2021: [Motion to Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.