U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00532-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MOODY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 06, 2021: [Exclude]
  • December 06, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • November 29, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Complaint]
  • October 15, 2021: [Warrant Quashed]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.