U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00525-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MATTHEWS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • May 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Exclude]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Exclude]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • January 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 03, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2021: [Exclude]
  • August 18, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 26, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • July 23, 2021: [.Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 23, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 23, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 22, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.