U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00530-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 27, 2021: [.Order]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 22, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • July 22, 2021: [Seal Case]
  • July 22, 2021: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.