U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00101
  • Case Name: CRAIGVILLE TELEPHONE CO et al v. WILKINSON BARKER KNAUER LLP
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Receipt and Acknowledgment of Transfer Papers]
  • August 26, 2021: [Case Transferred Out]
  • August 16, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order Transferring Case]
  • August 12, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice of QC]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 26, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • July 23, 2021: [Motion to Compel (Initiating)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.