U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00541-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MESSER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 17, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 17, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 17, 2021: [Exclude]
  • August 17, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 09, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 06, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.