U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00533-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LAZAR
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • August 18, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • August 16, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 16, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 12, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • August 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 11, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Filing Trial Exhibits Introduced Into Evidence]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 05, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • August 05, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 27, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.