U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00538-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DOUGLAS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • May 05, 2022: [Vacate]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 11, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 11, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 11, 2021: [Exclude]
  • August 11, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 27, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 27, 2021: [.Order]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 27, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • July 27, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 27, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.