U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00100
  • Case Name: In Re: SUPERIOR COURT SUBPOENAS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal of Motion]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • September 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 02, 2021: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 30, 2021: [Quash]
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Removal of Subpoena]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.