U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00535-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WIEDRICH
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 26, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 09, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 09, 2021: [Exclude]
  • August 09, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 09, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Response to motion]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 05, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • August 03, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 02, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.