U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00523-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COOPER et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 09, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 09, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 09, 2021: [Exclude]
  • August 09, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • August 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 09, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 08, 2021: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • August 06, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 04, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 04, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.