U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00545-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SLAEKER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 03, 2021: [Transcript]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 24, 2021: [Disclosure ]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 12, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 12, 2021: [Exclude]
  • August 12, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 09, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 06, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 04, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.