U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00104
  • Case Name: ALLIED AVIATION SERVICE COMPANY OF NEW JERSEY v. NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARDS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
  • September 30, 2022: [Special Master Report]
  • September 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • September 02, 2022: [Vacate]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • June 16, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 16, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • June 10, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • June 08, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • June 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Status Report]
  • June 03, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendations of Special Master]
  • June 02, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [Declaration]
  • May 16, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • May 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 16, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • May 16, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 16, 2022: [Vacate]
  • May 16, 2022: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • May 05, 2022: [Transcript]
  • May 03, 2022: [.Order]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Status Report]
  • April 08, 2022: [Standing Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice of QC]
  • February 23, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 04, 2021: [USCA Order (No Link)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.