U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00065
  • Case Name: IN RE NON-PARTY SUBPOENA TO THE CENTER FOR THE STUDY OF SOCIAL POLICY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Notice of QC]
  • January 24, 2023: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 17, 2023: [Status Report]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • August 23, 2021: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 09, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • August 06, 2021: [Motion to Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.