U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00103
  • Case Name: ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES LLC et al C v. R.J. REYNOLDS VAPOR COMPANY et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [.Order]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 17, 2021: [Status Report]
  • December 08, 2021: [Transcript]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • November 03, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 02, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • October 20, 2021: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • October 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to]
  • September 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to]
  • September 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to]
  • September 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to]
  • August 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to]
  • August 07, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • August 05, 2021: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • August 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.