U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00550-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BALLENGER et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 10, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Supplement to any document]
  • September 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 17, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 17, 2021: [Exclude]
  • August 16, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 10, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2021: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.