U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00539-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BALLARD
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Transcript]
  • September 02, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 22, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 22, 2021: [Exclude]
  • August 22, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Review]
  • August 18, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 18, 2021: [Bond Set/Reset]
  • August 18, 2021: [~Util - Defendant Committed]
  • August 18, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2021: [Response to motion]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 13, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [Review]
  • August 10, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 10, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.