U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00537-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CARICO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • November 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Disclosure ]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 23, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • August 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 21, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 21, 2021: [Exclude]
  • August 17, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 13, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 12, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • August 12, 2021: [Seal Case]
  • August 12, 2021: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.