U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00553-1
  • Case Name: USA v. METEER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Protective Order ]
August, 2021
  • August 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 19, 2021: [Exclude]
  • August 19, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 12, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 12, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 12, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.