U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00508-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GUNBY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • September 17, 2021: [Protective Order ]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 23, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 21, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 21, 2021: [Exclude]
  • August 21, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 13, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 12, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.