U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00560-1
  • Case Name: USA v. IRWIN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 30, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2021: [Exclude]
  • August 30, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 18, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 18, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.