U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00543-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 30, 2021: [Exclude]
  • August 30, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 30, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • August 21, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 19, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.