U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00547-1
  • Case Name: USA v. YOUNG
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • October 06, 2021: [Stipulation]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [CJA 7 - Order Terminating Counsel ]
  • September 30, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 02, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 02, 2021: [Exclude]
  • September 02, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 21, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 20, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 20, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.