U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00109
  • Case Name: PHARMERICA CORPORATION v. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 31, 2022: [Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 10, 2021: [Status Report]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Case Stayed]
  • November 22, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Hold in Abeyance]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2021: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • August 25, 2021: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 23, 2021: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • August 23, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 20, 2021: [Stay]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 20, 2021: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • August 20, 2021: [Enforce]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.