U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00574-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BLUE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Dismissal of Magistrate Case by USA]
  • September 13, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 12, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
  • August 27, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 25, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 20, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Arrest - Rule 5]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.