U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00572-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SHROYER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • August 26, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 20, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.