U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00573-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROSEBERRY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Competency Hearing]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 23, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 20, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 20, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • August 20, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • August 20, 2021: [Seal Case]
  • August 20, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 20, 2021: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.