U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00527-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BYERLY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • July 25, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • July 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • July 25, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • July 18, 2022: [Status Report]
  • July 08, 2022: [Status Report]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Indictment]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Modify]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Transcript]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 24, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Indictment]
September, 2021
  • September 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 15, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 12, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 31, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 31, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 23, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.