U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00575-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • March 10, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Control Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 30, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 23, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Arrest - Rule 5]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.