U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00559-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SANTILLAN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 29, 2021: [Exclude]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 14, 2021: [Protective Order ]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 02, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 24, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.