U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00529-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PARKER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • January 27, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 07, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 06, 2021: [Status Conference]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 30, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 30, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • August 25, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2021: [Indictment]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.