U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00569-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PETTIT et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • December 21, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 02, 2021: [Stipulation]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 21, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Protective Order ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • September 23, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 30, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 30, 2021: [Exclude]
  • August 30, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 25, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.