U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00568-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILSON et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Waiver]
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Exclude]
  • December 27, 2021: [Waiver]
  • December 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2021: [Exclude]
  • October 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Protective Order ]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 30, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 30, 2021: [Exclude]
  • August 30, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 25, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.