U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00534-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PACHECO et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • November 09, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 09, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 09, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • January 05, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Modify]
  • December 26, 2021: [Vacate]
  • December 14, 2021: [Transcript]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Discovery]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 04, 2021: [Modify]
  • November 03, 2021: [Vacate]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 01, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
October, 2021
  • October 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 20, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • September 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 10, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 10, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 10, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 10, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 08, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 03, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • September 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 01, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 01, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Arrest ]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.