U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00535-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Statement of Offense]
  • April 08, 2025: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • April 08, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 08, 2025: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Referred for PSI Report]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: [Status Report]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • February 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 02, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Convert Hearing]
  • September 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 09, 2021: [Convert Hearing]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 02, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.