U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00543-1
  • Case Name: USA v. YAZDANI
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • November 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 24, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • November 23, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 23, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • November 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2022: [Modify]
  • November 10, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • November 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2022
  • October 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • August 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 11, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • July 29, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • July 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Exclude]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • April 05, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • April 01, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • March 11, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • March 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 10, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 10, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 10, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 08, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 04, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 08, 2022: [Protective Order ]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Status Conference]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 22, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 31, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 26, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.