U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00565-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROWN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 28, 2021: [Transcript]
  • September 17, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2021: [Exclude]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 03, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Review]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • August 31, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order]
  • August 31, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 27, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Stay]
  • August 26, 2021: [Review]
  • August 26, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.