U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00541-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DUONG
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Status Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Status Report]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Exclude]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 17, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 17, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 17, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 17, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 08, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.