U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00545-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BARTLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • February 08, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 19, 2021: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 19, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 19, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 19, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.