U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00110
  • Case Name: DOES 1-7 v. TALIBAN et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 06, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Final Judgment]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • December 10, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • December 06, 2021: [Reply to opposition to motion]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Response to motion]
  • November 15, 2021: [Quash]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • November 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 08, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 08, 2021: [Strike]
  • November 01, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 29, 2021: [Strike]
  • October 22, 2021: [Answer to Interrogatories on Writ of Attachment]
  • October 20, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 19, 2021: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2021: [Entry of Final Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • September 14, 2021: [Writ of Execution Issued]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.