U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00581-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SALAAM
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • September 22, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2021: [~Util - Medical/Mental Health Alert]
  • September 13, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 13, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.