U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00533-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GLASS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • December 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • September 23, 2022: [Factual Proffer]
  • September 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • September 23, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 15, 2022: [Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Convert Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Convert Hearing]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 18, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 05, 2022: [Vacate]
  • April 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • March 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2022: [Suppress]
  • March 18, 2022: [Exclude]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • February 07, 2022: [Attorney Appearance Pro Bono]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [Suppress]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 21, 2021: [Vacate]
  • September 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 14, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 14, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 10, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 31, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 31, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 30, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 30, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 30, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • August 30, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • August 30, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.