U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00582-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CUNNINGHAM
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 08, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 08, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 31, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 31, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • August 31, 2021: [Seal Case]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • August 31, 2021: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.