U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00549-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SELLS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Probation Order]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 20, 2022: [Transcript]
  • January 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 14, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • January 12, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 05, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • January 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • September 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 27, 2021: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • September 27, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • September 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 27, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2021: [.Order]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.