U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00539-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PERRETTA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • February 10, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • September 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 15, 2021: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • September 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • September 15, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 15, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • September 15, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.