U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00548-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WALDEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 14, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Transcript]
  • January 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 26, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 26, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 21, 2021: [Status Report]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 21, 2021: [Exclude]
  • September 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • September 03, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.