U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00552-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THOMAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Response to motion]
  • January 05, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Indictment]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 15, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • December 15, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Exclude]
  • May 06, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Indictment]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Exclude]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 30, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 30, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 30, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 24, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 03, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.